US HB6767 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow qualified education loan repayments from section 529 plans. This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow qualified tuition programs (known as 529 plans) to be used to repay qualified education loans. The bill allows up to $10,000 in distributions from a 529 plan to be used to pay the principal or interest on a qualified education loan of the designated beneficiary or a sibling of the beneficiary.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow qualified education loan repayments from section 529 plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-09-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6757 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1084 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB88 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
HR1084 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB88 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6767/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6767/BILLS-115hr6767ih.pdf |