US HR1084 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6756) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to promote new business innovation, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6757) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to encourage retirement and family savings, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6760) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent certain provisions of the Tax Cuts and Jobs Act affecting individuals, families, and small businesses; and providing for proceedings during the period from October 1, 2018, through November 12, 2018. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6756) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to promote new business innovation, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6757) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to encourage retirement and family savings, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6760) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent certain provisions of the Tax Cuts and Jobs Act affecting individuals, families, and small businesses; and providing for proceedings during the period from October 1, 2018, through November 12, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6756) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to promote new business innovation, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6757) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to encourage retirement and family savings, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6760) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent certain provisions of the Tax Cuts and Jobs Act affecting individuals, families, and small businesses; and providing for proceedings during the period from October 1, 2018, through November 12, 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 409 (Y: 227 N: 189 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 410 (Y: 226 N: 189 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-27HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 226 - 189 (Roll no. 410). (text: CR H9101-9102)
2018-09-27HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 189 (Roll no. 409).
2018-09-27HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1084.
2018-09-27HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H9101-9113)
2018-09-26HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 187.
2018-09-26HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 6756, H.R. 6757 and H.R. 6760.
2018-09-26HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-985, by Mr. Sessions.

Same As/Similar To

HB6756 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1084 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6757 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6760 (Related) 2018-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback