US HB3136 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Graduate Student Savings Act of 2017 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow funds paid to an individual to aid in the pursuit of graduate or postdoctoral study or research to be saved in an Individual Retirement Account (IRA). The bill permits the funds to be considered compensation for purposes of current law provisions that limit annual deductible IRA contributions to the lesser of: (1) the deductible amount permitted under current law, or (2) the compensation includible in the individual's gross income for the year.
Title
Graduate Student Savings Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] |
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1379 (Related) 2017-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2526 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6757 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1084 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2526 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6757 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1084 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Higher education
Income tax deductions
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Higher education
Income tax deductions
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3136/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3136/BILLS-115hr3136ih.pdf |