CA AB1840 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51523 and 51524 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California Dream for All Program: eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 17). |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-02-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 51523 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 51524 | Amended Code | Citation Text |