US HB605 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permit kindergarten through grade 12 educational expenses to be paid from a 529 account.
Title
Student Empowerment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] |
Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. David Cawthorn [R-NC] |
Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB44 (Same As) 2021-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1757 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3704 (Related) 2021-06-04 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7269 (Related) 2022-03-29 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4726 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8913 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1757 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3704 (Related) 2021-06-04 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7269 (Related) 2022-03-29 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4726 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8913 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/605/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr605/BILLS-117hr605ih.pdf |