US SB1757 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to have education funds follow the student.
Title
Children Have Opportunities in Classrooms Everywhere Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Tommy Tuberville [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB605 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB44 (Related) 2021-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3704 (Same As) 2021-06-04 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB44 (Related) 2021-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3704 (Same As) 2021-06-04 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1757/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1757/BILLS-117s1757is.pdf |