US SB44 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permit kindergarten through grade 12 educational expenses to be paid from a 529 account.
Title
Student Empowerment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] |
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB605 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1757 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3704 (Related) 2021-06-04 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7269 (Related) 2022-03-29 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4726 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8913 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1757 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3704 (Related) 2021-06-04 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7269 (Related) 2022-03-29 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4726 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8913 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/44/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s44/BILLS-117s44is.pdf |