US HB8913 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 121-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent certain provisions of the Tax Cuts and Jobs Act affecting individuals, families, and small businesses, and for other purposes.
Title
TCJA Permanency Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-09-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB605 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6658 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB8214 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB44 (Related) 2021-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6658 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB8214 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB44 (Related) 2021-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8913/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8913/BILLS-117hr8913ih.pdf |