US HB335 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Became Public Law No: 117-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the first person nominated and appointed as Secretary of Defense after 12 p.m. (Eastern Standard Time) on January 20, 2021, to be a person who is, on the date of appointment, at least four years after relief from active duty as a commissioned officer of a regular component of the Armed Forces. Under current law, an individual may not be appointed as Secretary of Defense within seven years after relief from such active duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide for an exception to a limitation against appointment of persons as Secretary of Defense within seven years of relief from active duty as a regular commissioned officer of the Armed Forces.

Sponsors

Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22HouseBecame Public Law No: 117-1.
2021-01-22HouseSigned by President.
2021-01-21HousePresented to President.
2021-01-21SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-01-21SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed (under the order of 1/21/21, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative) without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 69 - 27. Record Vote Number: 4. (consideration: CR S86-87)
2021-01-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-01-21HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 326 - 78 (Roll no. 18). (text: CR H210)
2021-01-21HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to a previous order of the House.
2021-01-21HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to a previous special order, the House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 335.
2021-01-21HouseConsidered pursuant to a previous order. (consideration: CR H209-219)
2021-01-21HouseConsideration initiated pursuant to a previous order.
2021-01-21HouseORDER OF PROCEDURE - Mr. McGovern asked for unanimous consent that it be in order at any time to consider H.R. 335 in the House if called up by the chair of the Committee on Armed Services or his designee; that all points of order against consideration of the bill be waived; that the bill be considered as read; that all points of order against provisions in the bill be waiverd; and that the previous question be considered as ordered on the bill and on any amendment thereto to final passage without intervening motion except: (1) one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the chair and ranking minority member of the Committee on Armed Services or their respective designees; and (2) one motion to recommit. Agreed to without objection.
2021-01-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
2021-01-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB12 (Related) 2021-01-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 3.
SB11 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1037)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback