US SB12 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for an exception to a limitation against appointment of persons as Secretary of Defense within seven years of relief from active duty as a regular commissioned officer of the Armed Forces.
Title
A bill to provide for an exception to a limitation against appointment of persons as Secretary of Defense within seven years of relief from active duty as a regular commissioned officer of the Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 3. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee on Armed Services. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. Without written report. |
2021-01-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB11 (Related) 2021-03-06 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
HB335 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Became Public Law No: 117-1.
HB335 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Became Public Law No: 117-1.