US SB11 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1037)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the first person nominated and appointed as Secretary of Defense after 12:01 p.m. (Eastern Standard Time) on January 20, 2021, to be a person who is, on the date of appointment, at least four years after relief from active duty as a commissioned officer of a regular component of the Armed Forces. Under current law, an individual may not be appointed as Secretary of Defense within seven years after relief from such active duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to provide for an exception to a limitation against appointment of persons as Secretary of Defense within seven years of relief from active duty as a regular commissioned officer of the Armed Forces.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1037)
2021-03-03SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S999)
2021-01-06SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1.
2021-01-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Same As/Similar To

SB12 (Related) 2021-01-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 3.
HB335 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Became Public Law No: 117-1.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback