US HB2878 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a Native VetSuccess at Tribal Colleges and Universities Pilot Program, and for other purposes.
Title
Native VetSuccess at Tribal Colleges and Universities Pilot Program Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-05-18 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-05-18 | House | Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 403, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 144, as amended; H.R. 204, as amended; H.R. 210, as amended; H.R. 240; H.R. 707, as amended; H.R. 711, as amended; H.R. 1157, as amended; H.R. 1447, as amended; H.R. 1510, as amended; H.R. 1711, as amended; H.R. 2027; H.R. 2167, as amended; H.R. 2441; H.R. 2494; H.R. 2533; H.R. 2655, as amended; H.R. 2695, H.R. 2704; H.R. 2788; H.R. 2878, as amended; and H.R. 3008. (consideration: CR H2482-2520; text: CR H2518-2519) |
2021-05-18 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 403, proceedings on H.R. 2878 are considered vacated. |
2021-05-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-05-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2878. |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2369-2372; text: CR H2369-2370) |
2021-05-17 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-05-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR403 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2419 (Related) 2021-05-04 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 6.
HB2335 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB2419 (Related) 2021-05-04 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 6.
HB2335 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.