US HB2335 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the amount authorized to be appropriated for the high technology pilot program of the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
VET TEC Enhancement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] |
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2878 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2335/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2335/BILLS-117hr2335ih.pdf |