US HB2722 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

SAFE Act Securing America's Federal Elections Act This bill addresses election security through grant programs and requirements for voting systems and paper ballots. The bill establishes requirements for voting systems, including that systems (1) use individual, durable, voter-verified paper ballots; (2) make a voter's marked ballot available for inspection and verification by the voter before the vote is cast; (3) ensure that individuals with disabilities are given an equivalent opportunity to vote, including with privacy and independence, in a manner that produces a voter-verified paper ballot; and (4) be manufactured in the United States. The National Science Foundation must award grants to study, test, and develop accessible voter-verified paper ballot voting and best practices to enhance the accessibility of such voting for individuals with disabilities, for voters whose primary language is not English, and for voters with difficulties in literacy. The Election Assistance Commission (EAC) must award grants to states to (1) replace certain voting systems, carry out voting system security improvements, and implement and model best practices for ballot design, ballot instructions, and the testing of ballots; and (2) conduct risk-limiting audits. States may use elections requirements payments to carry out activities related to election security. The EAC must provide for the testing of voting system hardware and software and decertify such technology that does not meet guidelines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFE Act Securing America's Federal Elections Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - On passage RC# 428 (Y: 225 N: 184 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 427 (Y: 189 N: 220 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
2019-06-27HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-27HouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 225 - 184 (Roll no. 428). (text: CR H4207-4214)
2019-06-27HouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 189 - 220 (Roll no. 427).
2019-06-27HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
2019-06-27HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Rodney Davis (IL) motion to recommit with instructions, pending reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add a new section to the bill that would require each chief state election official to disclose the identity of any foreign national with access to certain voting materials, including ballots or voting machines. Subsequently, the point of order was withdrawn.
2019-06-27HouseMr. Davis, Rodney moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on House Administration.
2019-06-27HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5243-5246)
2019-06-27HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule 19, the Chair postponed further proceedings on H.R. 2722.
2019-06-27HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-06-27HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2722.
2019-06-27HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2722 and H.R. 3351. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2722 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. Also, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3351 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate.
2019-06-27HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 460. (consideration: CR H5207-5223)
2019-06-26HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 94.
2019-06-26HouseCommittee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
2019-06-26HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 116-129, Part I.
2019-06-24HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 460 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2722 and H.R. 3351. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2722 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. Also, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3351 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate.
2019-06-21HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 6 - 3.
2019-06-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-14HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-14HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1540 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB2660 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR460 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2053 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback