US HB2652 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires states, beginning in November 2022, to use voting machines manufactured in the United States for federal elections.
Title
Secure American-Made Voting Machines Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB2660 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2722 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1540 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB2053 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2660 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2722 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1540 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB2053 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Congressional elections
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
Manufacturing
State and local government operations
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
Manufacturing
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2652/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2652/BILLS-116hr2652ih.pdf |