US HB2660 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses election security through grant programs and requirements for voting systems and paper ballots. The bill establishes requirements for voting systems, including that systems (1) use individual, durable, voter-verified paper ballots; (2) make a voter's marked ballot available for inspection and verification by the voter before the vote is cast; (3) ensure that individuals with disabilities are given an equivalent opportunity to vote, including with privacy and independence, in a manner that produces a voter-verified paper ballot; and (4) be manufactured in the United States. The National Science Foundation must award grants to study, test, and develop accessible voter-verified paper ballot voting and best practices to enhance the accessibility of such voting for individuals with disabilities, for voters whose primary language is not English, and for voters with difficulties in literacy. The Election Assistance Commission (EAC) must award grants to states to (1) replace certain voting systems, carry out voting system security improvements, and implement and model best practices for ballot design, ballot instructions, and the testing of ballots; and (2) conduct risk-limiting audits. The bill provides for information sharing with states regarding threats to election infrastructure. The Department of Homeland Security must issue a national strategy to protect against cyberattacks, influence operations, disinformation campaigns, and other activities that could undermine the security and integrity of democratic institutions. The EAC must provide for the testing of voting system hardware and software and decertify such technology that does not meet guidelines.
Title
Election Security Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Science, Space, and Technology, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Science, Space, and Technology, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Science, Space, and Technology, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Science, Space, and Technology, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Science, Space, and Technology, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Science, Space, and Technology, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2722 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HR460 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2053 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1540 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2652 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB8697 (Related) 2020-10-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
HR460 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2053 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1540 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2652 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB8697 (Related) 2020-10-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Buy American requirements
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Manufacturing
Public contracts and procurement
State and local government operations
Subversive activities
Technology assessment
Buy American requirements
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Manufacturing
Public contracts and procurement
State and local government operations
Subversive activities
Technology assessment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2660/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2660/BILLS-116hr2660ih.pdf |