US HB2718 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize funding for programs to prevent, investigate, and prosecute elder abuse, neglect, and exploitation, and for other purposes.
Title
Elder Justice Reauthorization and Modernization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Seth Magaziner [D-RI] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D-FL] | Rep. Hillary Scholten [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-04-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2692 (Related) 2023-04-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1198 (Related) 2023-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3437 (Related) 2023-12-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7929 (Related) 2024-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1198 (Related) 2023-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3437 (Related) 2023-12-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7929 (Related) 2024-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2718/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2718/BILLS-118hr2718ih.pdf |