US HB2358 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Science, Space, and Technology, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To modernize voter registration, promote access to voting for individuals with disabilities, protect the ability of individuals to exercise the right to vote in elections for Federal office, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Empowerment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Science, Space, and Technology, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-05HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Science, Space, and Technology, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-05HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Science, Space, and Technology, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-05HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Science, Space, and Technology, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-05HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Science, Space, and Technology, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-05HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Science, Space, and Technology, Oversight and Reform, Education and Labor, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
2021-04-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB954 (Related) 2021-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
HB65 (Related) 2021-01-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB126 (Related) 2021-01-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB222 (Related) 2021-01-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB576 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB635 (Related) 2021-02-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB639 (Related) 2021-02-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB640 (Related) 2021-02-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB641 (Related) 2021-02-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB642 (Related) 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB775 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB776 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB827 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB1059 (Related) 2021-02-15 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1245 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1274 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1278 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1307 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB1422 (Related) 2021-02-26 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB481 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
HB3867 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects

Advisory bodies
Aging
Civil actions and liability
Congressional elections
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Disability and paralysis
Disaster relief and insurance
Election Assistance Commission
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employee hiring
Family relationships
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
Military personnel and dependents
Natural disasters
Northern Ireland
Postal service
Public contracts and procurement
State and local government operations
U.S. territories and protectorates
Voting rights
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback