US HB126 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Election Assistance Commission to carry out a pilot program under which the Commission shall provide funds to local educational agencies for initiatives to provide voter registration information to secondary school students in the 12th grade.
Title
Students Voicing Opinions in Today’s Elections (VOTE) Act
Sponsors
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
HR179 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2358 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HR179 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2358 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/126/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr126/BILLS-117hr126ih.pdf |