US HB827 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Postmaster General to modify any hard copy change of address form used by the United States Postal Service to include a reminder to update voter registration, and for other purposes.
Title
Voter Registration Promotion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
HR179 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB954 (Related) 2021-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2358 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
HR179 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB954 (Related) 2021-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2358 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/827/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr827/BILLS-117hr827ih.pdf |