US HB2329 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-21 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-21 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring a Response for Servicemembers Act - Directs each lending institution subject to specified interest rate requirements under the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to designate an employee as a compliance officer responsible for ensuring the institution's compliance and distributing information to servicemembers regarding applicable obligations and liabilities. Requires, during any fiscal year, such lending institutions with annual assets of at least $10 billion for the preceding fiscal year to maintain a toll-free telephone number and make the number available on the institution's primary Internet website.
Title
Ensuring a Response for Servicemembers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Charles Bass [R-NH] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] |
Rep. Jo Emerson [R-MO] | Rep. Steven LaTourette [R-OH] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Todd Platts [R-PA] |
Rep. Jean Schmidt [R-OH] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-21 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2011-07-21 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2011-07-07 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Prior to Referral. |
2011-06-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2329/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2329/BILLS-112hr2329ih.pdf |