US HB1795 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DUE PROCESS Act of 2017 Deterring Undue Enforcement by Protecting Rights Of Citizens from Excessive Searches and Seizures Act of 2017 This bill amends the federal criminal code to revise provisions related to federal civil forfeiture cases. Specifically, the bill: raises the evidentiary standard in such cases from preponderance of the evidence to clear and convincing evidence; with respect to property owners who are indigent, provides for the appointment of counsel; provides for recovery of attorney's fees with respect to settled claims in which the claimant prevails; adds notice requirements; and expedites and otherwise modifies certain procedures. The Department of Justice (DOJ) must: (1) annually audit federal civil forfeiture cases, and (2) establish a publicly available database with respect to seizures in such cases. Finally, the bill amends the federal judicial code to authorize DOJ to use amounts from the DOJ Assets Forfeiture Fund to pay for costs associated with a seized animal, including transportation, shelter, care, veterinary services, and humane euthanasia.
Title
DUE PROCESS Act of 2017 Deterring Undue Enforcement by Protecting Rights Of Citizens from Excessive Searches and Seizures Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] |
Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB398 (Related) 2017-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Due process and equal protection
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Gambling
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Law enforcement administration and funding
Lawyers and legal services
Legal fees and court costs
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Due process and equal protection
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Gambling
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Law enforcement administration and funding
Lawyers and legal services
Legal fees and court costs
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1795/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1795/BILLS-115hr1795ih.pdf |