US HB398 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HEART Act of 2017 Help Extract Animals from Red Tape Act of 2017 This bill amends the federal criminal code to modify the notice period in civil forfeiture proceedings that involve the seizure of an animal involved in animal fighting. It requires the government to send notice of the seizure to interested parties within 30 days (currently, 60 days). The notice period may be extended only if a delay is warranted after considering certain factors, including the cost to the government of providing shelter for the animal, the health of the animal and the effect of a delay on its rehabilitation, and any increased risk that a delay could necessitate the euthanasia of the animal. The bill amends the federal judicial code to authorize the Department of Justice to use amounts from the Department of Justice Assets Forfeiture Fund to pay for costs associated with a seized animal, including transportation, shelter, care, veterinary services, and humane euthanasia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEART Act of 2017 Help Extract Animals from Red Tape Act of 2017

Sponsors

Rep. John Katko [R]Rep. Judy Chu [D]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D]
Rep. Walter Jones [R]Rep. Daniel Donovan [R]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R]Rep. Don Bacon [R]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D]Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D]Rep. Ted Lieu [D]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D]
Rep. Charles Dent [R]Rep. Peter King [R]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R]Rep. Martha McSally [R]Rep. Tom Marino [R]
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D]Rep. Henry Johnson [D]Rep. Patrick Meehan [R]Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D]Rep. Steve Cohen [D]Rep. Blake Farenthold [R]Rep. Chris Collins [R]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D]Rep. Ruben Kihuen [D]Rep. Barbara Lee [D]Rep. Ted Yoho [R]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D]Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R]Rep. Michael McCaul [R]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D]
Rep. Mike Quigley [D]Rep. Michael Turner [R]Rep. Katherine Clark [D]Rep. Ryan Costello [R]
Rep. John Faso [R]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R]Rep. Dave Brat [R]
Rep. Edward Royce [R]Rep. James McGovern [D]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D]Rep. Jared Polis [D]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D]Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D]
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D]Rep. Rodney Davis [R]Rep. Frank Pallone [D]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R]Rep. Mike Coffman [R]Rep. David Joyce [R]
Rep. Robert Scott [D]Rep. Val Demings [D]Rep. Charlie Crist [D]Rep. John Sarbanes [D]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D]Rep. Scott Tipton [R]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D]Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R]Rep. David Young [R]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
2017-01-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1795 (Related) 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB2633 (Related) 2018-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback