US HB1347 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 242 of title 18, United States Code, to forbid the use of chokeholds by persons subject to that provision's prohibitions, and for other purposes.
Title
Eric Garner Excessive Use of Force Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1280 (Related) 2021-03-09 - Received in the Senate.
SB244 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB244 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1347/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1347/BILLS-117hr1347ih.pdf |