US HB1280 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 200-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To hold law enforcement accountable for misconduct in court, improve transparency through data collection, and reform police training and policies.
Title
George Floyd Justice in Policing Act of 2021 Police Exercising Absolute Care With Everyone Act of 2021 End Racial and Religious Profiling Act of 2021 Police Reporting Information, Data, and Evidence Act of 2021 Closing the Law Enforcement Consent Loophole Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - On passage (Y: 220 N: 212 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 208 N: 219 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 208 N: 219 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2021-03-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-03-03 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 212 (Roll no. 60). (text: CR H1039-1054) |
2021-03-03 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 208 - 219 (Roll no. 59). |
2021-03-03 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-03-03 | House | Ms. Malliotakis moved to recommit to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H1069) |
2021-03-03 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-03-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1280. |
2021-03-03 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1 and H.R. 1280. Rule provides for 1 hour of general debate on H.R. 1 and one motion to recommit. Rule provides for 1 hour of general debate on H.R. 1280 and one motion to recommit. |
2021-03-03 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 179. (consideration: CR H1039-1071) |
2021-03-01 | House | Rule H. Res. 179 passed House. |
2021-03-01 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 179 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1 and H.R. 1280. Rule provides for 1 hour of general debate on H.R. 1 and one motion to recommit. Rule provides for 1 hour of general debate on H.R. 1280 and one motion to recommit. |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR179 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB353 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1163 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1347 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB597 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2172 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3026 (Related) 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1694 (Related) 2021-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB353 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1163 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1347 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB597 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2172 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3026 (Related) 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1694 (Related) 2021-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.