US HB1188 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal Ethanol Subsidies Today Act of 2011 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to provide for the immediate repeal (the current expiration date is December 31, 2011) of the income and excise tax credits for alchol fuel mixtures (ethanol).
Title
Repeal Ethanol Subsidies Today Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] |
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Lynn Woolsey [D-CA] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1075 (Related) 2011-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB520 (Related) 2011-03-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB871 (Related) 2011-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1057 (Related) 2011-05-25 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
SB520 (Related) 2011-03-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB871 (Related) 2011-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1057 (Related) 2011-05-25 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
Subjects
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Alternative and renewable resources
Income tax credits
Motor fuels
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Alternative and renewable resources
Income tax credits
Motor fuels
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1188/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1188/BILLS-112hr1188ih.pdf |