US SB1057 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ethanol Subsidy and Tariff Repeal Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to advance the termination date of the income and excise tax credits for alcohol fuel mixtures (ethanol) from December 31, 2011, to the later of June 30, 2011, or the enactment of this Act. Amends the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States to allow, on or after June 30, 2011, duty-free treatment for ethyl alcohol or any mixture containing ethyl alcohol (ethanol).
Title
Ethanol Subsidy and Tariff Repeal Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Coburn [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69. |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1075 (Related) 2011-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1188 (Related) 2011-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB520 (Related) 2011-03-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB871 (Same As) 2011-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1188 (Related) 2011-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB520 (Related) 2011-03-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB871 (Same As) 2011-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Income tax credits
Motor fuels
Sales and excise taxes
Tariffs
Taxation
Income tax credits
Motor fuels
Sales and excise taxes
Tariffs
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/1057/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s1057/BILLS-112s1057pcs.pdf |