TX SB1533 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reimbursement of certain urban teaching hospitals for the provision of inpatient hospital care under Medicaid.
Title
Relating to the reimbursement of certain urban teaching hospitals for the provision of inpatient hospital care under Medicaid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2955 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1533 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01533I.htm |