TX HB2955 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reimbursement of certain urban teaching hospitals for the provision of inpatient hospital care under Medicaid.
Title
Relating to the reimbursement of certain urban teaching hospitals for the provision of inpatient hospital care under Medicaid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1533 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID