TX SB1096 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Medicaid managed care program, including the provision of pharmacy benefits.
Title
Relating to the Medicaid managed care program, including the provision of pharmacy benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] |
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1980 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Motion to table fails RV#1505 (Y: 60 N: 82 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1980 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Motion to table fails RV#1505 (Y: 60 N: 82 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1980 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-22 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-22 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1508 |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1507 |
2019-05-17 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-17 | House | Amended 4-S. Davis |
2019-05-17 | House | Amended 3-S. Davis |
2019-05-17 | House | Amended 2-S. Davis |
2019-05-17 | House | Amended 1-S. Davis |
2019-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1505 |
2019-05-17 | House | Motion to table fails 1-S. Davis |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-S. Davis |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3685 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS