TX HB3685 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 @ 10:30 am in E2.026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to pharmacy benefits provided through the Medicaid managed care program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to pharmacy benefits provided through the Medicaid managed care program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-19HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1096 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback