TX HR1882 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating members of the Griffin Middle School Choir who participated in the Lewisville ISD East Zone Choir Solo and Ensemble Competition.
Title
Congratulating members of the Griffin Middle School Choir who participated in the Lewisville ISD East Zone Choir Solo and Ensemble Competition.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-06 | House | Filed |