TX HB3976 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the administration of and benefits payable under the Texas Public School Retired Employees Group Benefits Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administration of and benefits payable under the Texas Public School Retired Employees Group Benefits Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1770 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#767 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#698 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenatePassed
2017-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenatePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-21SenateRecord vote
2017-05-21SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-21SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-03HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-03HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-04-03HouseRead first time
2017-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3976
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03976I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03976H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03976E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03976S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03976F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3976&RcdVtNo=698&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3976&RcdVtNo=767&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-21-F2.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-21-F2.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3976&RcdVtNo=1770&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017

Bill Comments

feedback