TX HB3614 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allowing public schools to employ or accept as volunteers chaplains.
Title
Relating to allowing public schools to employ or accept as volunteers chaplains.
Sponsors
Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Rep. Dustin Burrows [R] | Rep. Cody Harris [R] |
Rep. Ben Bumgarner [R] | Rep. Kronda Thimesch [R] | Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2023-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 763 |
2023-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-21 | House | Public hearing continued on . . . |
2023-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB763 (Similar To) 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
SB763 (Similar To) 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
SB763 (Similar To) 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Religion
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Religion