TX SB763 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allowing public schools to employ or accept as volunteers chaplains.
Title
Relating to allowing public schools to employ or accept as volunteers chaplains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2078 (Y: 84 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1383 (Y: 89 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1382 (Y: 62 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-08 - House - Amended RV#1280 (Y: 84 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1279 (Y: 57 N: 80 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2023-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1278 (Y: 59 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1277 (Y: 61 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1276 (Y: 59 N: 77 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1383 (Y: 89 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1382 (Y: 62 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-08 - House - Amended RV#1280 (Y: 84 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1279 (Y: 57 N: 80 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2023-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1278 (Y: 59 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1277 (Y: 61 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-05-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1276 (Y: 59 N: 77 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-24 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2023-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#2078 |
2023-05-24 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2023-05-23 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2023-05-19 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2023-05-15 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-15 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2023-05-15 | House | House appoints conferees |
2023-05-15 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2023-05-11 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-11 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2023-05-11 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-11 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-10 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1383 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1382 |
2023-05-09 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Rose |
2023-05-09 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2023-05-09 | House | Postponed 5/9/23 6:00 PM |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1280 |
2023-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-08 | House | Amended 7-Hinojosa |
2023-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1279 |
2023-05-08 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 6-Zwiener |
2023-05-08 | House | Amended 5-Hinojosa |
2023-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1278 |
2023-05-08 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 4-Wu |
2023-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1277 |
2023-05-08 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 3-Talarico |
2023-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1276 |
2023-05-08 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 2-Wu |
2023-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Talarico |
2023-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3614 |
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-28 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-04-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Middleton |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3614 (Similar To) 2023-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB3614 (Similar To) 2023-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB3614 (Similar To) 2023-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS
Religion
VOLUNTEERS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS
Religion
VOLUNTEERS