TX HB2942 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Referred to Finance
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Referred to Finance
Summary
Relating to accountability and transparency in government operations, including disclosure, oversight, and enforcement measures; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to accountability and transparency in government operations, including disclosure, oversight, and enforcement measures; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-18 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-18 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-15 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed as amended | |
2009-05-15 | Amended | |
2009-05-15 | Amended | |
2009-05-15 | Amended | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-14 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-14 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-14 | Amended | |
2009-05-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
AUDITOR, STATE
FISCAL RESPONSIBILITY OFFICE, TEXAS
INTERNET
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
LEGISLATIVE LIBRARY BOARD
LEGISLATIVE REFERENCE LIBRARY
RECOVERY ACT ACCOUNTABILITY BOARD
STATE ACCOUNTABILITY OFFICE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & TRANSPARENCY ACT OF 2009
FISCAL RESPONSIBILITY OFFICE, TEXAS
INTERNET
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
LEGISLATIVE LIBRARY BOARD
LEGISLATIVE REFERENCE LIBRARY
RECOVERY ACT ACCOUNTABILITY BOARD
STATE ACCOUNTABILITY OFFICE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & TRANSPARENCY ACT OF 2009