TX HB1022 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a written declaration to designate a guardian before the need for a guardian arises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a written declaration to designate a guardian before the need for a guardian arises.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-19SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-20HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-13HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-11HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-03-06HouseRead first time
2017-01-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback