TN SB3808 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, creates the "Financial Management Modernization System of the County of Sumner, Tennessee of 2012"; repeals Chapter 113 of the Private Acts of 2002, in certain circumstances.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, creates the "Financial Management Modernization System of the County of Sumner, Tennessee of 2012"; repeals Chapter 113 of the Private Acts of 2002, in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pr. Ch. 70 | |
2012-05-29 | Effective date(s) | |
2012-05-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-05-01 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-01 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-04-26 | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 2 | |
2012-04-26 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1239) | |
2012-04-26 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-04-25 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-04-24 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-24 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1254) | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-02 | P2C held on desk. Local Bill | |
2012-03-29 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-03-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3879 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 70