TN HB3879 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, creates the "Financial Management Modernization System of the County of Sumner, Tennessee of 2012"; repeals Chapter 113 of the Private Acts of 2002, in certain circumstances.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, creates the "Financial Management Modernization System of the County of Sumner, Tennessee of 2012"; repeals Chapter 113 of the Private Acts of 2002, in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 70 | |
2012-04-26 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-24 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-03-29 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-03-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3808 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 70