TN SB2674 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an employer to permit an employee who is a local elected official to leave work in order to perform the duties of the elected office; requires the employer to permit the employee to use the employee’s available paid time off for that purpose if the employee elects to do so; permits an employer to require the employee to submit a written statement from a local elections official to verify that the employee is a local elected official. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 50, relative to employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2734 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee