TN SB2587 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the county election commission to select the voting machines to be purchased for use in the county and ensure the destruction of the voting machines when the machines are deemed obsolete; makes related changes. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2 and Title 5, relative to voting equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Effective date(s) 04/29/2024 | |
2024-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 817 | |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 66, Nays 20, PNV 1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0814) |
2024-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 23, Nays 5 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0764) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2096 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 817