TN HB2096 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 817
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 817
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the county election commission to select the voting machines to be purchased for use in the county and ensure the destruction of the voting machines when the machines are deemed obsolete; makes related changes. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2 and Title 5, relative to voting equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 817 | |
2024-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2587 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2024