TN SB1999 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates Class B felony of selling, possessing, or manufacturing 15 grams or more of any substance containing fentanyl and Class A felony if the substance contains 150 grams or more of fentanyl. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 39, Chapter 16; Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
As introduced, creates Class B felony of selling, possessing, or manufacturing 15 grams or more of any substance containing fentanyl and Class A felony if the substance contains 150 grams or more of fentanyl. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 39, Chapter 16; Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1709 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee