TN HB1709 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates Class B felony of selling, possessing, or manufacturing 15 grams or more of any substance containing fentanyl and Class A felony if the substance contains 150 grams or more of fentanyl. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 39, Chapter 16; Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
As introduced, creates Class B felony of selling, possessing, or manufacturing 15 grams or more of any substance containing fentanyl and Class A felony if the substance contains 150 grams or more of fentanyl. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 39, Chapter 16; Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] | Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Health |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1999 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee