TN SB1709 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 870
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 870
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the creation of a corn promotion board and an assessment of one cent per bushel sold if a majority of corn producers voting in a referendum on the question vote in favor of such measures. - Amends TCA Title 43.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the creation of a corn promotion board and an assessment of one cent per bushel sold if a majority of corn producers voting in a referendum on the question vote in favor of such measures. - Amends TCA Title 43.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 870 | |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/19/18 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1601 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 870