TN HB1601 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 870
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 870
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the creation of a corn promotion board and an assessment of one cent per bushel sold if a majority of corn producers voting in a referendum on the question vote in favor of such measures. - Amends TCA Title 43.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the creation of a corn promotion board and an assessment of one cent per bushel sold if a majority of corn producers voting in a referendum on the question vote in favor of such measures. - Amends TCA Title 43.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Sanderson [R] | Rep. Curtis Halford [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. Ron Lollar [R] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 870 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0590) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0671) |
2018-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/6/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 1/31/2018 |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2018-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1709 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 870