TN SB1608 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Slow Poke Law," which prohibits the operation of vehicles in the left lane of interstates and multilane divided highways, except for passing and other purposes. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Slow Poke Law," which prohibits the operation of vehicles in the left lane of interstates and multilane divided highways, except for passing and other purposes. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 842 | |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2016 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/28/2016 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1416 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 842