TN HB1416 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Slow Poke Law," which prohibits the operation of vehicles in the left lane of interstates and multilane divided highways, except for passing and other purposes. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Slow Poke Law," which prohibits the operation of vehicles in the left lane of interstates and multilane divided highways, except for passing and other purposes. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 842 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2016 | |
2016-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 21, Nays 7, PNV 2 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0899) |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 13, PNV 4 |
2016-03-07 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0583) |
2016-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 1/27/2016 |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-10-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1608 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 842