CA AB2289 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - In committee: Referred to suspense file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - In committee: Referred to suspense file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 295.5, 5007, 22511.55, and 22511.59 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: parking placards and special license plates for disabled veterans and persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2289 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2289 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and M. & V.A. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 22511.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 22511.59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 295.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 5007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |