TN SB1566 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates exceptions to the offense of open or concealed carrying of a firearm with the intent to go armed for any person legally in possession and not prohibited from possessing a firearm; converts existing defenses to be exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 50 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, creates exceptions to the offense of open or concealed carrying of a firearm with the intent to go armed for any person legally in possession and not prohibited from possessing a firearm; converts existing defenses to be exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 50 and Title 70.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1553 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-15 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020